Search results
Other games
Atlantic W L PCT GB L10 Boston64 18 .780 0.0 7-3 New York50 32 .610 14.0 6-4 Philadelphia47 35 .573 17.0 8-2 Brooklyn32 50 .390 32.0 5-5 Toronto25 57 .305 39.0 2-8 Southeast W L PCT GB L10 Orlando47 35 .573 0.0 5-5 Miami46 36 .561 1.0 7-3 Atlanta36 46 .439 11.0 3-7 Charlotte21 61 .256 26.0 3-7 Washington15 67 .183 32.0 1-9 People also ask
Who owns San Antonio Spurs?
Will Spurs stay in San Antonio?
When did the Spurs move to San Antonio?
Who are the Spurs' biggest shareholders?
He is the former CEO of HoltCat, the largest Caterpillar dealership in the United States and former chairman, CEO, and owner of Spurs Sports & Entertainment, which owns the NBA's San Antonio Spurs, the USL's San Antonio FC, the AHL's San Antonio Rampage, and the NBA G League's Austin Spurs.
Jun 20, 2023 · Brothers Bruce, one of the founders of Designated Bidders, LLC, the group of San Antonio executives who acquired the San Antonio Missions baseball team in 2022, and Russell.
- Tom Orsborn
- Sports Reporter
The Holts joined the ownership group of San Antonio Spurs, LLC in 1996. Spurs Sports & Entertainment owns four professional sports franchises – the San Antonio Spurs, San...
Dec 20, 2023 · SAN ANTONIO -- The McCombs family has purchased a share of the San Antonio Spurs, returning after 30 years to the organization its patriarch helped establish and once owned.
Dec 20, 2023 · Billy Joe “Red” McCombs owned at least a share of the Spurs for 11 years and was the team’s primary owner for five years. McCombs, who died on Feb. 19 at age 95 after a lengthy illness, was a driving force in bringing the franchise to San Antonio in 1973.
Jun 18, 2021 · Peter and his sister, Corinna Holt Richter, represent the family on the organization’s board of managers. The Holt family remains the largest shareholder of the San Antonio Spurs.
May 12, 2022 · In 2019, Peter J. Holt succeeded his mother, Julianna Hawn Holt, as chairman of Spurs Sports & Entertainment, which owns and operates the San Antonio Spurs and the AT&T Center.