Search results
- Telkom, South Africa's third-largest mobile operator, has appointed former Industrial Development Corporation CEO Mvuleni Geoffrey Qhena as its new board chair with effect from 1 April.
www.news24.com/fin24/companies/telkom-appoints-former-idc-ceo-geoffrey-qhena-as-its-new-chair-20230322Telkom appoints former IDC CEO Geoffrey Qhena as its new ...
People also ask
Who is mvuleni Geoffrey qhena?
Who is Geoffrey qhena?
When does qhena resign from Telkom?
Who is qhena & what does he do?
MVULENI GEOFFREY QHENA. CHAIRMAN OF THE BOARD (CHAIRMAN NOMINATION COMMITTEE, MEMBER REMUNERATION COMMITTEE, MEMBER LOGISTICS COMMITTEE)
Mvuleni Geoffrey Qhena is a businessperson who has been at the helm of 5 different companies and presently holds the position of Chairman at Telkom SA SOC Ltd. and Independent Non-Executive Chairman...
Dec 31, 2023 · Mvuleni Geoffrey Qhena (58) Board chairperson and independent non‑executive director Director since 19 April 2021 and board chairperson since 27 May 2021
Mar 23, 2023 · Mvuleni Geoffrey Qhena has been appointed as a non-executive director and chairman of Telkom’s board. Qhena’s nomination as director takes effect on March 27, 2023, and his duties as chair begin on April 1.
Mar 22, 2023 · Telkom has announced the appointment of Mvuleni Geoffrey Qhena as a non-executive director and chairman of its board. Qhena’s appointment as director is effective from 27 March 2023, while...
Mar 22, 2023 · Telkom SA SOC Limited announced the appointment of Mr. Mvuleni Geoffrey Qhena as an independent Non- Executive Director with effect from 27 March 2023 and Chairperson of the Board of Directors with effect from 01 April 2023.